+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On September 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On August 14, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor