+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 27, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 8, 2022, pending concurrence
On July 20, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation