+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2019
On October 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Governor
- Enacted - see Roll Call #113 [39 YEAS - 0 NAYS]
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted - 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 116)
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On August 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor