+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On September 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2017
On September 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 18, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House amendment
- Rules suspended
On September 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On August 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On August 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and place in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor