+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 29, 2014 in the Senate:
On July 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On July 21, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred
On July 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
- Rules suspended
On July 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor