+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 () adopted
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second
- New draft substituted, see S2533
On September 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2533
- Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday September 23, 2021
On July 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor