+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 29, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor