+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 305 of the Acts of 2014
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On August 14, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted
On August 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
+ − Vote
July 8, 2014: Senate Roll Call # 390
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Senate Ethics and Rules
Type:
Primary Sponsor