+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy