+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment
- Rules suspended
On December 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor