+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 28, 2016 in the Senate:
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2016 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in 222
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/15/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
- Rules suspended
On October 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor