+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor