+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2015
On December 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 30, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On December 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On December 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor