+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 172 of the Acts of 2014
On July 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted
On July 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House amendment
- Rules suspended
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
+ − Sponsor
Senate Ethics and Rules
Type:
Primary Sponsor