+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor