+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2014
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
- Rules suspended
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently