+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, see S2478
- Read second
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the day for Thursday, January 30, 2020
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2478
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor