+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 22, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy