+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2014 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
On December 23, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On November 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor