+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On December 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2015
On November 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 25, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House amendment
- Rules suspended
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On August 31, 2015 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On August 24, 2015 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second (amended), ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 24, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 07/28/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437
- Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
Floor Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor