+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 3, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5250
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor