+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 163 of the Acts of 2013
On November 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 21, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 21, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Committee recommended ought to pass
- Rules suspended
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
On November 20, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
On November 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
On November 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
On October 28, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
- Rules suspended
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor