+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor