+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On December 14, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor