+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
On October 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2370 and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight