+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On October 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2013
On October 21, 2013 in the House:
- Resolve passed
On October 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolve passed and laid before the Governor
On October 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House amendment
- Rules suspended
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to be engrossed
- Amendment 2 adopted
- Amendment 1 adopted
- Read third
On August 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H3607
- Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Read second
- Rules suspended
- Amendment adopted, as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means, see H3607
- Ordered to a third reading
On July 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
+ − Vote
July 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call # 142
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Senate Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor