+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2013
On November 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 3, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On September 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor