+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor