+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On July 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor