+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On October 15, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5040
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 7, 2020, pending concurrence
On July 17, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor