+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 8, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4449
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday May 15, 2014, pending concurrence
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 02/05/2014 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation