+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 03, 2014, pending concurrence
On November 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor