+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- No further action taken
- Joint session held and dissolved
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, December 16, 2020
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, May 13, 2020
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, November 13, 2019
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, June 12, 2019
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Called for consideration in the joint session
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported favorably by committee and placed on file
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported favorably by committee and placed on file
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Petition filed
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor