+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied H2440
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday May 5, 2022, pending concurrence
On October 14, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security