+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On September 21, 2017 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H3911
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor