+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2770
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On November 2, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health