+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, see S2332
- Read third
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service