+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2021
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Bill reported favorably by committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor