+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On October 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On July 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor