+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2752
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor