+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
- Accompanied by H2410
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor