+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2914
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor