+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2565
On October 16, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
On October 15, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor