+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2292
On December 4, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
On November 20, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
- Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor