+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On July 16, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor