+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2686
On March 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 03:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
- House concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 18, 2020, pending concurrence
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
On October 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health