+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second
- New draft substituted, see S2572
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor