+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- No further action taken
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On September 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on The Judiciary SJ 525.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor