+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2745
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor