+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2356
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Health Care Financing
On October 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor